NH HB101 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Lay on Table (Rep. Cali-Pitts): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 232-109 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to regulating possession of firearms in a school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to regulating possession of firearms in a school district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - Table (Y: 232 N: 109 NV: 14 Abs: 45) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseLay on Table (Rep. Cali-Pitts): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 232-109 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 52
2019-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 28
2019-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 02/19/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 37

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback