NH HB1004 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to penalties for failure to provide information after an animal injury.
Title
Relative to penalties for failure to provide information after an animal injury.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hopper [R] | Rep. Keith Erf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-6; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-10-29 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |