NH HB100 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 122; Eff. 6/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition and use of toy smoke devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition and use of toy smoke devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-19HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 122; Eff. 6/16/2017
2017-05-24HouseEnrolled 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 9
2017-05-24SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/18/2017); Senate Journal 18
2017-05-11SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 19Y-4N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2017; Senate Calendar 22
2017-04-06SenateHearing: 05/02/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 18
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7
2017-01-26HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0057h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 2
2017-01-26HouseAmendment #2017-0057h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 2
2017-01-18HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0057h for 01/26/2017 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-01-11HouseExecutive Session: 01/17/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-04HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2016-12-21HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback