NH HA1 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Ought Not to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Ought Not to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Seeking the removal from office of superior court judge James D. O'Neill, III.
Title
Seeking the removal from office of superior court judge James D. O'Neill, III.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Ought Not to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 47 |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought Not to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 26 |
2018-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 25 |