NH CACR36 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Committee Amendment # 2022-0701s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Committee Amendment # 2022-0701s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Residency for the purpose of voting. Providing that only residents of the state may vote in elections.
Title
Residency for the purpose of voting. Providing that only residents of the state may vote in elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] |
Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] |
Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Denise Ricciardi [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Rep. Bob Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0701s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | No Pending Motion; 03/17/2022 Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0701s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Failed, lacking necessary 3/5; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0701s, 03/17/2022; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0701s, 02/24/2022; Senate Calendar 8 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2022, Room Representatives Hall, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |