NH CACR27 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 254-85 03/31/2022 House Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 254-85 03/31/2022 House Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Elected and appointed officials. Providing that all state court judges shall be subject to recall and removal by petition and vote of registered voters pursuant to provisions established by the legislature.
Title
Elected and appointed officials. Providing that all state court judges shall be subject to recall and removal by petition and vote of registered voters pursuant to provisions established by the legislature.
Sponsors
Rep. Norman Silber [R] | Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] | Rep. William Foster [R] | Rep. Betty Gay [R] |
Rep. JD Bernardy [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - ITL (Y: 254 N: 85 NV: 23 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 254-85 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-21 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Torosian) 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-04 | House | Executive Session: 01/12/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2022 2:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Legislative Administration |