NH CACR20 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-18 - Lay CACR0020 on Table (Rep. Abbas): Motion Failed DV 165-166 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-18 - Lay CACR0020 on Table (Rep. Abbas): Motion Failed DV 165-166 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to personal liberty. Providing that adults shall have the right to possess cannabis for personal consumption.
Title
Relating to personal liberty. Providing that adults shall have the right to possess cannabis for personal consumption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Lay CACR0020 on Table (Rep. Abbas): Motion Failed DV 165-166 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 214-121 03/15/2022 |
2022-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 01/20/2022 02:00 pm State House Reps Hall |
2022-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 02:00 pm State House Reps Hall |
2021-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |