NH CACR19 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 195-160 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 195-160 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to paper ballots. Providing that all elections shall be conducted through paper ballots.
Title
Relating to paper ballots. Providing that all elections shall be conducted through paper ballots.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Pearson [R] | Rep. David Milz [R] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - OTP (Y: 195 N: 160 NV: 14 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 195-160 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-02-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-02-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2022 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2022-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2022 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2021-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Election Law |