NH CACR17 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-08 - Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to ballot measures. Providing that upon petition by voters, a question may be placed on the ballot of a statewide election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to ballot measures. Providing that upon petition by voters, a question may be placed on the ballot of a statewide election.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/13/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
2021-11-03HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Election Law

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback