NH CACR16 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to local governance. Providing that local construction projects seeking amendments, waivers, or variances be subject to certain local approval, disclosure, and vote requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to local governance. Providing that local construction projects seeking amendments, waivers, or variances be subject to certain local approval, disclosure, and vote requirements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-21HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 14
2024-03-15HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/11/2024 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)
2024-03-06HouseExecutive Session: 03/11/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
2024-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2024 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303
2023-12-01HouseIntroduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Municipal and County Government

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback