NH CACR11 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Lay on Table (Rep. Cali-Pitts): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 158-151 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Lay on Table (Rep. Cali-Pitts): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 158-151 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to taxes. Providing that a broad-based sales tax shall be prohibited.
Title
Relating to taxes. Providing that a broad-based sales tax shall be prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - Table (Y: 158 N: 151 NV: 53 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Cali-Pitts): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 158-151 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 48 |
2019-03-07 | House | Special Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60 |
2019-02-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-02-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 21 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 24 |