NH CACR10 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 208-78; House Journal 24, PG. 883
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 208-78; House Journal 24, PG. 883
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to term of office. Providing that beginning with the 2018 general election, there shall be a 4-year term of office for governor.
Title
Relating to term of office. Providing that beginning with the 2018 general election, there shall be a 4-year term of office for governor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 208-78; House Journal 24, PG. 883 |
2015-03-11 | House | Special Order (Rep A. Christie): Motion Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 883 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 9-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 423 |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 3/2/2015 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 220 |