NH CACR1 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-128; House Journal 22, PG. 570-572
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-128; House Journal 22, PG. 570-572
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to taxation. Providing that a 3/5 vote is required to pass legislation imposing new or increased taxes or license fees, or to authorize the issuance of state bonds and providing that the general court shall appropriate funds for payment of interest and installments of principal of all state bonds.
Title
Relating to taxation. Providing that a 3/5 vote is required to pass legislation imposing new or increased taxes or license fees, or to authorize the issuance of state bonds and providing that the general court shall appropriate funds for payment of interest and installments of principal of all state bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 226 N: 128 NV: 37 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-128; House Journal 22, PG. 570-572 |
2015-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 18-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 355 |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG. 212 |