NE LR95 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide the Honor and Remember Flag is adopted as an official symbol of the State of Nebraska

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide the Honor and Remember Flag is adopted as an official symbol of the State of Nebraska

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-18LegislatureAdopted
2017-05-15LegislatureReported to the Legislature for further consideration
2017-05-08LegislatureNotice of hearing for May 15, 2017
2017-04-11LegislatureKolowski name added
2017-04-11LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-04-10LegislatureSpeaker's announcement
2017-04-10LegislatureLaid over
2017-04-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback