NE LR91 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-27 - Notice of hearing for December 15, 2017
Pending: Legislature Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Interim study to examine the public employees' retirement systems administered by the Public Employees Retirement Board

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interim study to examine the public employees' retirement systems administered by the Public Employees Retirement Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-27LegislatureNotice of hearing for December 15, 2017
2017-11-27LegislatureNotice of hearing for December 01, 2017 (cancel)
2017-09-18LegislatureNotice of hearing for December 01, 2017
2017-05-15LegislatureReferred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
2017-04-05LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2017-04-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback