NE LR60 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-10 - Notice of hearing for October 06, 2017
Pending: Legislature Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-10 - Notice of hearing for October 06, 2017
Pending: Legislature Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine issues related to the use of tax-increment financing
Title
Interim study to examine issues related to the use of tax-increment financing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 06, 2017 |
2017-07-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 29, 2017 |
2017-07-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for August 24, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=32412 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR60.pdf |