NE LR5 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Accept the findings and recommendations of the Healthy Soils Task Force submitted to the Governor and the Agriculture Committee
Title
Accept the findings and recommendations of the Healthy Soils Task Force submitted to the Governor and the Agriculture Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Legislature - Adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Legislature - Agriculture AM197 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Legislature - Agriculture AM197 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Enrolled resolution |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Correctly enrolled |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Adopted |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Agriculture AM197 adopted |
2021-03-25 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2021-02-11 | Legislature | Agriculture AM197 filed |
2021-02-11 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration with AM197 |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2021 |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Laid over |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |