NE LR48 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize the need for the Legislature to understand the circumstances and practices surrounding the interruptions in electricity to residents in the state
Title
Recognize the need for the Legislature to understand the circumstances and practices surrounding the interruptions in electricity to residents in the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2021-02-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2021 |
2021-02-19 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-19 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2021-02-19 | Legislature | Laid over |
2021-02-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |