NE LR457 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - Notice of hearing for September 07, 2018
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - Notice of hearing for September 07, 2018
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine state fiscal resources that exist to support first generation students
Title
Interim study to examine state fiscal resources that exist to support first generation students
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 07, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=36333 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR457.pdf |