NE LR455 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Report
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Report
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide the Executive Board of the Legislative Council appoint a special committee to examine issues related to the impacts of climate change on the State of Nebraska
Title
Provide the Executive Board of the Legislative Council appoint a special committee to examine issues related to the impacts of climate change on the State of Nebraska
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Haar [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Report |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Enrolled resolution |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Correctly enrolled |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Adopted |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Haar AM2892 adopted |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Executive Board AM2521 adopted |
2016-04-06 | Legislature | Haar AM2892 filed |
2016-03-10 | Legislature | Executive Board AM2521 filed |
2016-03-10 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration with AM2521 |
2016-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 08, 2016 |
2016-03-01 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Laid over |
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Date of introduction |