NE LR390CA | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment requiring community colleges funding by sales and income taxes and not property taxes
Title
Constitutional amendment requiring community colleges funding by sales and income taxes and not property taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Al Davis [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2016 |
2016-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28722 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR390CA.pdf |