NE LR370 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Notice of hearing for September 07, 2018
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Interim study to conduct a review of issues arising from the lack of mental health treatment for those in the criminal justice system

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interim study to conduct a review of issues arising from the lack of mental health treatment for those in the criminal justice system

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for September 07, 2018
2018-04-04LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2018-03-26LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2018-03-26LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback