NE LR361 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - Notice of hearing for October 19, 2018
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - Notice of hearing for October 19, 2018
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the extent of the parking shortage in the Capitol environs
Title
Interim study to examine the extent of the parking shortage in the Capitol environs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 19, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=36018 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR361.pdf |