NE LR318 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-21 - Notice of hearing for December 01, 2015
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-21 - Notice of hearing for December 01, 2015
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to conduct a comprehensive study of Nebraska's state and local roads system
Title
Interim study to conduct a comprehensive study of Nebraska's state and local roads system
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 01, 2015 |
2015-10-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for November 12, 2015 (cancel) |
2015-10-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 27, 2015 |
2015-10-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 22, 2015 (cancel) |
2015-08-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 03, 2015 |
2015-08-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for November 12, 2015 |
2015-08-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 22, 2015 |
2015-08-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 05, 2015 |
2015-08-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 01, 2015 |
2015-08-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 16, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |