NE LR317 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-03 - Notice of hearing for November 06, 2020
Pending: Legislature Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Interim study to carry out section 13-2402 which requires the Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee to monitor defined benefit plans administered by political subdivisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interim study to carry out section 13-2402 which requires the Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee to monitor defined benefit plans administered by political subdivisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-03LegislatureNotice of hearing for November 06, 2020
2020-07-30LegislatureReferred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
2020-02-13LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2020-02-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback