NE LR317 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-08 - Notice of hearing for October 27, 2015
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-08 - Notice of hearing for October 27, 2015
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to review the Nebraska Rules of the Road and provisions which establish maximum weight limits
Title
Interim study to review the Nebraska Rules of the Road and provisions which establish maximum weight limits
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 27, 2015 |
2015-10-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 22, 2015 (cancel) |
2015-08-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 16, 2015 (cancel) |
2015-08-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 03, 2015 |
2015-08-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 22, 2015 |
2015-08-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 06, 2015 |
2015-08-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 01, 2015 |
2015-08-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 16, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |