NE LR307 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-24 - Notice of hearing for September 25, 2015
Pending: Legislature General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-24 - Notice of hearing for September 25, 2015
Pending: Legislature General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine issues under the jurisdiction of the General Affairs Committee
Title
Interim study to examine issues under the jurisdiction of the General Affairs Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 25, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |