NE LR29CA | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover resolution
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment to provide term limits for the members of the State Board of Education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment to provide term limits for the members of the State Board of Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover resolution
2023-02-28LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 07, 2023
2023-01-20LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2023-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback