NE LR297 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide each resolution petitioning Congress to call for a constitutional convention under Article V of the Constitution included in this resolution be automatically rescinded if the convention is not called on or before January 1, 2021
Title
Provide each resolution petitioning Congress to call for a constitutional convention under Article V of the Constitution included in this resolution be automatically rescinded if the convention is not called on or before January 1, 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 27, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Laid over |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41308 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR297.pdf |