NE LR288 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urge Congress and the United States Corps of Engineers to prioritize flood control as a top priority for the management of water systems under their authority in the Missouri River Mainstream Reservoir System Water Control Manual
Title
Urge Congress and the United States Corps of Engineers to prioritize flood control as a top priority for the management of water systems under their authority in the Missouri River Mainstream Reservoir System Water Control Manual
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Slama [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Legislature - Adopted (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-02-27 | Legislature | Adopted |
2020-02-27 | Legislature | Chambers MO159 withdrawn |
2020-02-27 | Legislature | Chambers MO159 Bracket until April 22, 2020 filed |
2020-02-20 | Legislature | Slama priority resolution |
2020-02-10 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration |
2020-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Laid over |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |