NE LR286 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution proposing an election to call a state constitutional convention to amend Article VIII and other revenue provisions of the Constitution of Nebraska

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution proposing an election to call a state constitutional convention to amend Article VIII and other revenue provisions of the Constitution of Nebraska

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-02-01LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 14, 2018
2018-01-18LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2018-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback