NE LR283CA | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to create the Legislative Salary Commission
Title
Constitutional amendment to create the Legislative Salary Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2024 |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |