NE LR278CA | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to change the membership of the State Board of Education
Title
Constitutional amendment to change the membership of the State Board of Education
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Murman [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2024 |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |