NE LR278CA | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to eliminate the State Board of Education and provide for the Governor to appoint the Commissioner of Education
Title
Constitutional amendment to eliminate the State Board of Education and provide for the Governor to appoint the Commissioner of Education
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2022 |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |