NE LR277CA | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment to require the Legislature to enact laws providing for life imprisonment for sex or labor trafficking of a minor and certain sex offenses involving minors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment to require the Legislature to enact laws providing for life imprisonment for sex or labor trafficking of a minor and certain sex offenses involving minors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2024-02-21LegislatureAlbrecht name added
2024-02-21LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 28, 2024
2024-02-21LegislatureSanders AM2572 filed
2024-02-08LegislatureSanders priority resolution
2024-01-17LegislatureHalloran name added
2024-01-09LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2024-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback