NE LR277 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Rescind any previous resolutions calling for U.S. Constitution Article V conventions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rescind any previous resolutions calling for U.S. Constitution Article V conventions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-02-01LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 14, 2018
2018-01-10LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2018-01-09LegislatureSpeaker's announcement
2018-01-09LegislatureLaid over
2018-01-09LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback