NE LR271 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Name the building owned by this state, and located at 1526 K Street, Lincoln, Nebraska, as the First Nebraska Administrative Building, and name the building owned by this state and located at 521 South 14th Street, Lincoln, Nebraska, as Chief Standing Bear Justice Administration Building
Title
Name the building owned by this state, and located at 1526 K Street, Lincoln, Nebraska, as the First Nebraska Administrative Building, and name the building owned by this state and located at 521 South 14th Street, Lincoln, Nebraska, as Chief Standing Bear Justice Administration Building
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Adopted |
2022-02-03 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2022-01-07 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2022-01-07 | Legislature | Laid over |
2022-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |