NE LR269CA | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment to authorize the Legislature to delegate complete or partial sovereignty to one area of the state

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment to authorize the Legislature to delegate complete or partial sovereignty to one area of the state

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-03-07LegislatureFailed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-02-20LegislatureSchumacher priority resolution
2018-02-20LegislaturePlaced on General File
2018-01-16LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 31, 2018
2018-01-08LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2018-01-04LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback