NE LR263CA | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to require the Legislature to reimburse political subdivisions as prescribed
Title
Constitutional amendment to require the Legislature to reimburse political subdivisions as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Blood motion to overrule agenda withdrawn |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Blood motion to overrule agenda filed |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Dorn AM2841 filed |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Flood AM2838 filed |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2022-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-03-28 | Legislature | Pending |
2022-02-15 | Legislature | Blood priority resolution |
2022-02-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |