NE LR261 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-17 - Notice of hearing for October 01, 2021
Pending: Legislature Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-17 - Notice of hearing for October 01, 2021
Pending: Legislature Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the structure and administration of and compliance with taxes
Title
Interim study to examine the structure and administration of and compliance with taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 01, 2021 |
2021-08-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 01, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=46563 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LR261.pdf |