NE LR257 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approve the gift of labor and materials from the Nebraska Association of Former State Legislators for the restoration of the gardens of the State Capitol Courtyards
Title
Approve the gift of labor and materials from the Nebraska Association of Former State Legislators for the restoration of the gardens of the State Capitol Courtyards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Legislature - Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Legislature - Stinner AM1974 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Legislature - Stinner AM1974 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Enrolled resolution |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Correctly enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Adopted |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Stinner AM1974 adopted |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Stinner AM1974 filed |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | Laid over |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |