NE LR257 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Petition the appropriate officials to determine if the President is unable to discharge the responsibilities of his office
Title
Petition the appropriate officials to determine if the President is unable to discharge the responsibilities of his office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for April 03, 2018 |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Laid over |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33813 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR257.pdf |