NE LR242 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urge the congressional delegation of Nebraska to pass legislation that supports farmers, ranchers, and small meat processors without compromising food safety standards and foreign market access
Title
Urge the congressional delegation of Nebraska to pass legislation that supports farmers, ranchers, and small meat processors without compromising food safety standards and foreign market access
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2022 |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Laid over |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |