NE LR242 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-29 - Notice of hearing for September 08, 2017 (cancel)
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-29 - Notice of hearing for September 08, 2017 (cancel)
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the feasibility of zero-based budgeting for state agencies
Title
Interim study to examine the feasibility of zero-based budgeting for state agencies
Sponsors
Sen. John Kuehn [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 08, 2017 (cancel) |
2017-07-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 08, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Erdman name added |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33729 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR242.pdf |