NE LR23CA | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment to prohibit the levying of an inheritance tax

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment to prohibit the levying of an inheritance tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover resolution
2023-03-08LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 16, 2023
2023-02-13LegislatureLippincott name added
2023-02-10LegislatureDorn AM139 filed
2023-01-18LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2023-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback