NE LR238 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Notice of hearing for September 08, 2017
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Interim study to examine the feasibility of acquiring funding for behavioral and mental health internship programs at the doctoral level in rural Nebraska

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interim study to examine the feasibility of acquiring funding for behavioral and mental health internship programs at the doctoral level in rural Nebraska

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-15LegislatureNotice of hearing for September 08, 2017
2017-07-18LegislatureNotice of hearing for September 08, 2017
2017-05-15LegislatureReferred to Appropriations Committee
2017-05-10LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2017-05-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback