NE LR226 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-08 - Notice of hearing for October 20, 2021
Pending: Legislature Executive Board Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-08 - Notice of hearing for October 20, 2021
Pending: Legislature Executive Board Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine ways the Legislature provides oversight of state agencies
Title
Interim study to examine ways the Legislature provides oversight of state agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 20, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=46501 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LR226.pdf |