NE LR21CA | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to require the State of Nebraska to pay all classroom expenses related to the operation of public elementary and secondary schools
Title
Constitutional amendment to require the State of Nebraska to pay all classroom expenses related to the operation of public elementary and secondary schools
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2021-03-22 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2021-03-02 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2021-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2021 |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Murman name added |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |