NE LR214 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-31 - Notice of hearing for December 05, 2013
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-31 - Notice of hearing for December 05, 2013
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine Nebraska's statutes, rules, and regulations relating to the permitting process for small surface water storage reservoirs
Title
Interim study to examine Nebraska's statutes, rules, and regulations relating to the permitting process for small surface water storage reservoirs
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Carlson [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 05, 2013 |
2013-05-28 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2013-05-16 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2013-05-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=20873 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR214.pdf |