NE LR20CA | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to protect the right of individual privacy
Title
Constitutional amendment to protect the right of individual privacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2023-03-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 22, 2023 |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |